Parthasarathi, Usha Devi (CPSO#: 85359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Department of Emergency Psychiatry
50 Charlton Ave. E
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33243
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA DEVI PARTHASARATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTHASARATHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2006 to 22 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2008