Partington, Sara Lynn (CPSO#: 79720)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2007 to 19 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2008