Partridge, Michael Alan Craig (CPSO#: 57418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Chronic Pain Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Suite 2014
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-792-7890
Fax: 705-719-4878
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8920 Woodbine Ave.
Suite 102
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Canada
Phone: 905-305-9484
Fax: 905-305-7381
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Ave., Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Partridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Partridge ( CPSO# 57418 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2900

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Suite 101
500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 792-7890

Business Address:
8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALAN CRAIG PARTRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987