Partyka, Marcin (CPSO#: 101242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 22719
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIN PARTYKA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PARTYKA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. PARTYKA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PARTYKA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PARTYKA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PARTYKA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PARTYKA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018