Parulekar, Wendy Ranjana (CPSO#: 59586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
Southeastern Ontario at
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4503
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. WENDY RANJANA PARULEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARULEKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 03 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989