Parvez, Naeem (CPSO#: 75156)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2003