Pasenau, Allison Marie (CPSO#: 70259)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Hill, Allison Marie (used until: 21 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2003