Pasenau, Jeffrey Ernest Herbert (CPSO#: 69985)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2003