Pashby, Robert Christie (CPSO#: 24682)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017