Paskal-Tozlovanu, Viorika (CPSO#: 83123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian, Russian

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Effective June 1, 2013, patients can access their medical records by calling (613) 837-2121.
Date Received: 22 May 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIORIKA PASKAL-TOZLOVANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASKAL-TOZLOVANU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005