Pasquet, Eric Albert (CPSO#: 56300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-7878 Ext. 2118
Fax: (613) 721-4815
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Pasquet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pasquet ( CPSO# 56300 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC ALBERT PASQUET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASQUET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Sep 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Oct 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2007