Pasricha, Ajai Kumar (CPSO#: 64430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone: (905) 943-7382
Fax: (905) 943-9105
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2391 Eglinton Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: 416-750-9004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajai K. Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pasricha ( CPSO# 64430 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 943-7382

Business Address:
2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Phone Number: (416) 750-9000

Business Address:
Suite 206
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJAI KUMAR PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1992