Pasricha, Deepti (CPSO#: 66396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Jhamb, Deepti (used until: 19 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Physicians
377 Church Street
Suite 101
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999 Ext. 221
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deepti Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pasricha ( CPSO# 66396 )

Business Address:
1 - 122 Cornell Park Drive
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Business Address:
101 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPTI PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995