Pasricha, Suvercha (CPSO#: 71942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's Inpatient Program
Centre for Addicition and
Mental Health Room 936
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34540
Fax: (416) 979-4975
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUVERCHA PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998