Pasternak, Stephen Howard (CPSO#: 68821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cogntive Neurology
Parkwood Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
P.O. Box 5777 STN B
London ON  N6C 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6032
Fax: (519) 646-6226
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Pasternak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer ( CPSO# 67165 )
Dr. S. Pasternak ( CPSO# 68821 )

Business Address:
Cognitive Neurology and Alzheimer's Research Centr
Parkwood Hospital
Main Building Room A2-127
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6032


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Hirscheimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer ( CPSO# 67165 )
Dr. S. Pasternak ( CPSO# 68821 )

Business Address:
304 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 204-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD PASTERNAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTERNAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 1 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001