Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Pasut, Giorgio Gianni (CPSO#: 54095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Agency for Health
Protection and Promotion
Suite 300
480 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: (647) 260-7105
Fax: (647) 260-7600
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIORGIO GIANNI PASUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASUT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985