Pat, Arnold Cheuk Wang (CPSO#: 106715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Emergency Medicine
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: 416-243-3600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNOLD CHEUK WANG PAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017