Patel, Asha Thakor (CPSO#: 91393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Services
General Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32163
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA THAKOR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013