Patel, Dilip Gordhanbhai (CPSO#: 23295)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Baroda University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dilip G. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012


Corporation Name: Dilip G. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Inc 700 Industrial Road Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015