Patel, Fatma Subhashchandra (CPSO#: 44236)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Bombay, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Apr 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2002