Patel, Harshadrai Manibhai (CPSO#: 22556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview/Sheppard Diagnostic
701 Sheppard Ave. E
Suite 316
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 590-7915
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkway Nuclear Services
10 Angeline Street North
3rd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 328-6171
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

East York Diagnostic Ultrasound
45 Overlea Blvd.
Suite A8
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 421-5065
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kennedy/ Sheppard Diagnostic
4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Canada
Phone: (416) 299-9895
Fax: (416) 299-9221
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.M. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Patel ( CPSO# 22556 )

Business Address:
Parkway Nuclear Services
10 Angeline Street North
3rd Floor
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6171

Business Address:
Kennedy and Sheppard Diagnostic Clinic
Suite 304
4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Phone Number: (416) 299-9895

Business Address:
Bayview/Sheppard Diagnostic
Suite 316
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 590-7915

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARSHADRAI MANIBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1970