Patel, Hasmukh Gokalbhai (CPSO#: 43686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Bombay, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue,
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasmukh Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Patel ( CPSO# 43686 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8N 3S8
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASMUKH GOKALBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1995