Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Patel, Ila Maneklal (CPSO#: 59947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Delhi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkway Medical
325 Central Parkway West
unit 39
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Phone: (905) 276-7077
Fax: (905) 276-9589
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILA MANEKLAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989