Patel, Jayanti Bhogilal (CPSO#: 32106)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gujarat University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Patel & T. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Clinic York University Unit 28 4700 Keele Street Tel: (416) 479-8649 Fax: (416) 736-5523
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017