Patel, Jayantkumar (CPSO#: 30597)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 24 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Jan 1996