Patel, Ketan N (CPSO#: 73599)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ketan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 101B 111 Waterloo Street London ON N6B 2M4
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016