Patel, Keyur (CPSO#: 108026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2015

Expiry Date:  16 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Center for Liver Diseases
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 3403312
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keyur Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Patel ( CPSO# 108026)

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Centre for Liver Diseases
200 Elizabeth Street
9EN 232
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3312

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 23 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Keyur Patel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Gastroenterology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Patel holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Patel no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.



            Note: This certificate is issued on September 23, 2015, and currently has an
            interim expirydate of September 16, 2018, in accordance with the expiry date of
            your employmentauthorization issued by Citizenship and Immigration Canada. This
            certificate maybe extended in accordance with the renewal of your employment
            authorization.