Patel, Mitesh (CPSO#: 98744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitesh Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel ( CPSO# 98744 )

Business Address:
C A M H
1001 Queen Street West
Units 3 - 4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013