Patel, Mohammed Ameen (CPSO#: 60995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Medicine JHCC A3 69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73953
Fax: (905) 528-1662
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ameen Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel ( CPSO# 60995 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
Suite A3-69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AMEEN PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991