Patel, Nima (CPSO#: 60870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
156 Sears Street
Toronto ON  M4L 1B3
Phone: (416) 921-4834
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990