Patel, Nirav (CPSO#: 96114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 640-1103
Fax: (416) 640-1106
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GNMI
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Nirav  Patel  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology,
            only.