Patel, Parulben Kamlesh (CPSO#: 65877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Patel, Parulben Govindlal (used until: 11 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Baroda University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 430 Meadowood Drive Troy, OH 45373 USA
Date Received: 04 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015