Patel, Paulum Upendra (CPSO#: 69465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highbury Medical Clinic
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone: (519) 659-2331
Fax: (519) 659-4617
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Middlesex Community
Medical Clinic
268 Main Street
Parkhill ON  N0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (519) 294-6881
Fax: (519) 294-6982
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paulum U. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Patel ( CPSO# 69465 )

Business Address:
Highbury Medical Clinic
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
268 Main Street
Parkhill ON  N0M 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 294-6270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULUM UPENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2001