Patel, Piyush Ranchhodbhai (CPSO#: 53521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of London, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1310 Fewster Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 1A4
Phone: (905) 569-8100
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIYUSH RANCHHODBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1983