Patel, Rakesh Vishnu (CPSO#: 72255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Mailbox 207
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-9830
Fax: (613) 739-6695
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Dept. of Critical Care Medicine
Mailbox F242
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16405
Fax: (613) 761-5418
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.V. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patel ( CPSO# 72255 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Intensive Care Unit
Mail Box 207
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-9830

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Suite F202
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-6405

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH VISHNU PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003