Patel, Santhya (CPSO#: 67141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Mysore University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 336-4135
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Santhya Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 67141 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANTHYA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998