Patel, Sonal Jayantilal (CPSO#: 102186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C01
Unit A
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonal J. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 102186)

Business Address:
Suite C01, Unit A
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-2858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONAL JAYANTILAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016