Patel, Surendra Ramanbhai (CPSO#: 42388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Baroda University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Surendra Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 42388 )

Business Address:
407 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 739-2875

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 65082 Merivale Nepean, ON K2G 5Y3
Instructions: Medical record requests may be made to the above address to the attention of Dr. Surendra Patel.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURENDRA RAMANBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1990