Patel, Vimal Harihardas (CPSO#: 66094)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1996