Patel-Christopher, Abha (CPSO#: 59452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
541 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1W9
Phone: (519) 571-9127
Fax: (519) 571-8313
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abha Patel-Christopher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel-Christopher ( CPSO# 59452 )

Business Address:
541 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1W9
Phone Number: (519) 571-9127

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHA PATEL-CHRISTOPHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL-CHRISTOPHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989