Patelis-Siotis, Irene (CPSO#: 54178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Geneva, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
323 Kerr Street
suite 206
oakville
Oakville ON  L6K 3B6
Phone: (905) 842-8958
Fax: (905) 842-7605
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood Disorder Program
St Joseph Hospital, West Faith Camp
100, west 5th Strett
PO Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36334
Fax: (905) 3815625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patelis-Siotis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Patelis-Siotis ( CPSO# 54178 )

Business Address:
Mood Disorders Programme
100 West 5th Street
P O Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 388-2511

Business Address:
St joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
McMaster University
323 Kerr Street
Suite 206
Oakville ON  L6K 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 842-8958

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE PATELIS-SIOTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATELIS-SIOTIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989