Paterson, Craig Alexander (CPSO#: 65271)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002