Paterson, Faith Hallward (CPSO#: 65146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue des Grévilléas 140/7
Goma XXX XXX
Democratic Rep of Congo
Phone: 00243810367004
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faith Paterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Paterson ( CPSO# 65146 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAITH HALLWARD PATERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2008