Paterson, Ian Ross (CPSO#: 22764)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 707 Kipps Lane London, Ontario N5Y 3C3
Date Received: 06 Jan 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1992
Summary:

 On June 8, 1992, the Fitness to Practice Committee found that Dr. Paterson is an incapacitated 
 member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 63(1) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act.  On that date, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered terms, conditions 
 and limitations to be imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paterson.  

On March 
 6, 1997, the Committee made an order amending these terms, conditions and limitations.

Appeal: No Appeal

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 31, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 31, 2010, Dr. Paterson has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.