Paterson, William Grant (CPSO#: 51333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Gastroenterology
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2292
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Paterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Paterson ( CPSO# 51333 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Sydenham 477-C
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GRANT PATERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1986