Patey, Gregory Mayo (CPSO#: 32322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 544-2727
Fax: (613) 544-7247
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-4900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Patey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Patey ( CPSO# 32322 )

Business Address:
201 - 791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MAYO PATEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983