Patgunarajah, Anushi (CPSO#: 99573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6981 Millcreek Drive
Unit 2
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5N6B8
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

245 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON  L6K3Y6
Canada
Phone: 289-817-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

701 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: 289-768-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Malton Urgent Care Centre
Suite 110
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 672-0479
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Dixie Urgent Care Centre
1500 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4X1L4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W6N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anushi Patgunarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patgunarajah ( CPSO# 99573 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Urgent Care
4000 Highway 7
Unit 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2

Business Address:
6981 Millcreek Drive
Suite 2
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8

Business Address:
245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3Y6

Business Address:
3530 Derry Road East
Suite 2
Malton ON  L4T 4E3

Business Address:
Suite 10
25 Woodbine Down Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5

Business Address:
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Anushi Patgunarajah may practise medicine independently in family medicine.