Pathak, Irvin Kumar (CPSO#: 64973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
2020 Richmond Avenue
Victoria BC  V8R 6R5
Phone: (250) 595-5033

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRVIN KUMAR PATHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2006