Pathak, Rahul Shivaji (CPSO#: 107958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Allevio Pain Management
101-240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: 4168405990
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pain Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rahul Shivaji Pathak may practise medicine independently in pain medicine.