Patil, Krishna Vijaykumar (CPSO#: 104442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Seth G. S. Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2015